blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0885312

EP0885312 - USE OF SUGAR TENSIDES FOR DEGREASING LEATHERS AND HIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[1999/44]
Former [1998/52]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SEGURA, Ramon
Entenca, 206 3.1.
E-08029 Barcelona / ES
02 / AGUADO, Angel
Piazzale Europa n 1
IT 22074 Lomazzo(Como) / IT
[1999/04]
Former [1998/52]01 / SEGURA, Ramon
Entenca, 206 3.1.
E-08029 Barcelona / ES
02 / AGUADO, Angel
Plaza de Mil.lenari, 4,2.1.
E-08329 Teia / ES
Application number, filing date97907050.528.02.1997
[1998/52]
WO1997EP00972
Priority number, dateDE199610905608.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609056
[1998/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9733002
Date:12.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0885312
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885312
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.1997
ClassificationIPC:C14C5/00
[1998/52]
CPC:
C14C5/00 (EP); C11D1/835 (EP); C11D1/525 (EP);
C11D1/662 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   IT,   PT [1998/52]
Extension statesSI02.09.1998
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ZUCKERTENSIDEN ZUM ENTFETTEN VON LEDERN UND PELZEN[1998/52]
English:USE OF SUGAR TENSIDES FOR DEGREASING LEATHERS AND HIDES[1998/52]
French:UTILISATION D'AGENTS DE SURFACE A BASE DE SUCRE POUR DEGRAISSER LE CUIR ET LES PEAUX[1998/52]
Entry into regional phase02.09.1998National basic fee paid 
02.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/52]
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3420138  (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,3* page 10, line 1 - line 10; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2141734  (SANDOZ LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 33 - line 52; claim 1 *;
 [AD]DE4311113  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.