EP0844847 - SURGICAL STAPLER AND METHOD OF SURGICAL FASTENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. Development Of Advanced Medical Products Ltd. P.O. Box 844 Beer-Sheva 84106 / IL | [1998/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPOV, Sergey P.O. Box 4583 84144 Beer-Sheva / IL | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Colens, Alain M.G.M. Bureau Colens SPRL Rue Franz Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Colens, Alain c/o Bureau Colens SPRL rue Frans Merjay 21 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 97907256.8 | 20.03.1997 | [1998/23] | WO1997IL00104 | Priority number, date | IL19960117607 | 21.03.1996 Original published format: IL 11760796 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9734533 | Date: | 25.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844847 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/10, A61B17/115, A61B17/11, A61B17/072 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
A61B17/115 (EP);
A61B17/11 (EP);
A61B17/1114 (EP);
A61B17/1155 (EP);
A61B2017/07235 (EP);
A61B2017/2905 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | A61B17/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/23] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM CHIRURGISCHEN BEFESTIGEN | [1998/23] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLER AND METHOD OF SURGICAL FASTENING | [1998/23] | French: | AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE ET PROCEDE DE FIXATION CHIRURGICALE | [1998/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 08.05.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3795034 (STREKOPYTOV A, et al) [Y] 1,5,7,9-11,13,15,16 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US4198982 (FORTNER JOSEPH G [US], et al) [DA] 1,5,10,12,15,16 * column W *; | [A]US4930503 (PRUITT J CRAYTON [US]) [A] 1,2,5-7,9,11,15 * column A * * column 8, line 48 - line 64; figures 23-26 *; | [A]US5027834 (PRUITT J CRAYTON [US]) [A] 1,2,5,11,15 * column A * * column 12, line 8 - line 14; figure 25 * * figures 4,5,7 *; | [A]EP0449394 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,8* abstract *; | [Y]US5445644 (PIETRAFITTA JOSEPH J [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,7,9-11,13,15,16 * column 5, line 31 - line 56; figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [A]US4930503 (PRUITT J CRAYTON [US]); | [A]US5027834 (PRUITT J CRAYTON [US]); | [A]US5445644 (PIETRAFITTA JOSEPH J [US], et al) |