EP0890258 - INFRARED IMAGE SENSOR WITH INCORPORATED FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. Ramo di Azienda Alenia Difesa Piazza Monte Grappa, 4 00195 Roma / IT | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNANI, Mauro Viale Petrarca, 45 I-50124 Firenze / IT | 02 /
OLIVIERI, Monica Via Botticelli, 18 I-50018 Scandicci / IT | 03 /
PIERI, Silvano Via Campanella, 71 I-50019 Sesto Fiorentino / IT | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 97907271.7 | 20.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997IT00063 | Priority number, date | IT1996FI00059 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: IT FI960059 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736420 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890258 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890258 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/09, G02B13/14 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G02B13/14 (EP,US);
H04N23/23 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | INFRAROT-BILDSENSOR MIT INTEGRIERTEN FUNKTIONEN | [1999/02] | English: | INFRARED IMAGE SENSOR WITH INCORPORATED FUNCTIONS | [1999/02] | French: | DETECTEUR D'IMAGES EN INFRAROUGE AVEC FONCTIONS INCORPOREES | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2100548 (BRITISH AEROSPACE); | [X]EP0365948 (ELTRO GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0367481 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]EP0459010 (KOLLMORGEN CORP [US]) |