EP0894973 - ENGINE START CONTROLLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Kazuhiko Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Satoru Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-71 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 97907377.2 | 19.03.1997 | [1999/05] | WO1997JP00892 | Priority number, date | JP19960094537 | 16.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9453796 | [1999/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739238 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894973 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894973 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02N15/00, B60R25/04, E05B49/00, G07C9/00, F02N15/10 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
F02N15/10 (EP,US);
B60R25/04 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | F02N11/08, F02N15/00, B60R25/04, E05B49/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/05] | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG ZUM ANLASSEN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [1999/05] | English: | ENGINE START CONTROLLING APPARATUS | [1999/05] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DEMARRAGE POUR VEHICULE | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1998 | Translation filed | 06.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 06.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07315171 ; | [X]JPH07205759 ; | [X]US4553511 (HAYAKAWA SHOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 29 - line 57 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07315171 A 19951205 (OMRON CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07205759 A 19950808 (OMRON CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS6433876U ; | [X]JPH01116165 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [X]JPH0539766 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [X]JPH05296129 (KANSEI KK); | [X]JPH06227364 (KANSEI KK); | [X]JPH0872672 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [XP]JPH08244558 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XP]JPH08282444 (CALSONIC CORP); | [XP]JPH08282443 (CALSONIC CORP); | [XP]JPH0914109 (CALSONIC CORP); | [XP]JPH0995210 (DENSO CORP); | [XE]JPH09137746 (DENSO CORP); | [XE]JPH09142256 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |