blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977172

EP0977172 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING STARTING AND ENDING POINTS OF SOUND SECTION IN VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJITA, Takehiro
8-1, Nishikoigakubo 3-chome, Kokubunji-shi
Tokyo 185 / JP
02 / MIYATAKE, Takafumi
1585-10, Tatemachi, Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 193 / JP
03 / NAGASAKA, Akio
13-8, Higashikoigakubo 6-chome, Kokubunji-shi
Tokyo 185 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Strehl & Partner mbB
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97907389.719.03.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997JP00905
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841978
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977172
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:G10L9/00, H04N5/76, G11B20/10, G11B27/10
[2000/51]
CPC:
G11B20/10 (EP,US); G11B27/105 (EP,US); G11B27/107 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US); G11B27/22 (EP,US); G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US); G10L2025/783 (EP,US); G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US); G11B2220/90 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/05]G10L9/00, H04N5/76, G11B20/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FESTSTELLEN DES BEGINN- UND ENDPUNKTES EINER KLANGSEKTION IN VIDEO[2000/05]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING STARTING AND ENDING POINTS OF SOUND SECTION IN VIDEO[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A DETECTER DES POINTS DE DEPART ET DE TERMINAISON D'UNE SECTION SON DANS UNE SEQUENCE VIDEO[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1999Translation filed 
12.10.1999National basic fee paid 
12.10.1999Search fee paid 
12.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
05.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0991928  ;
 [Y]US5596680  (CHOW YEN-LU [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 26-34,48-56 * * column 2, lines 30,31 *;
 [Y]  - PATEL N V ET AL, "Audio characterization for video indexing", STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL FOR STILL IMAGE AND VIDEO DATABASES IV, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, 1-2 FEB. 1996, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1996, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 2670, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 373 - 384, XP000953251 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.234776
 [A]  - KANADA T, "IMMERSION INTO VISUAL MEDIA: NEW APPLICATIONS OF IMAGE UNDERSTANDING", IEEE EXPERT,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (19960201), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 0885-9000, pages 73 - 80, XP000585056 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/64.482961
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09091928 A 19970404 (NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP ) [A] 7-18 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS60498  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS6029800  (TOSHIBA KK);
 [Y]JPH0528717  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JPH06302160  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JPH08205076  (CANON KK);
 [X]JPH08279962  (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG)
 [A]  - TAKAFUMI MIYATAKE, HITOSHI MATSUSHIAMA, MASAKAZU EJIRI, "High-Speed Computing Method for Maximum/Minimum Image Filtering (in Japanese)", THE TRANSACTION OF IEICE, Vol. J78 D-II, No. 11, 25 November 1995, p. 1598-1607.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.