EP0842901 - POWDER FOR LOWER LAYER OF COATING TYPE MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOWA Electronics Materials Co., Ltd. 4-14-1, Soto-Kanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Dowa Holdings Co., Ltd. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Dowa Mining Co., Ltd. 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISANO, Seiichi Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Kazuhisa Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
SANO, Kazushi Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
KONNO, Shinichi Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 05 /
HORIKAWA, Yoshichika Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 06 /
AIHARA, Yasuhiko Dowa Mining Co., Ltd., 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97907409.3 | 21.03.1997 | [1998/21] | WO1997JP00927 | Priority number, date | JP19960089976 | 21.03.1996 Original published format: JP 8997696 | JP19960220746 | 05.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22074696 | [1998/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9734830 | Date: | 25.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0842901 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/02, G11B5/70, C09C1/24 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
C09C1/22 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G49/0018 (EP,US);
C01G49/0045 (EP,US);
C01G49/0054 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (EP,US);
C09C1/24 (EP,US);
G11B5/733 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
C01P2006/37 (EP,US);
C01P2006/42 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/21] | C01G49/02, G11B5/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/21] | Title | German: | TEILCHEN FÜR UNTERE LAGE EINER BESCHICHTUNG EINES MAGNETISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS | [1998/21] | English: | POWDER FOR LOWER LAYER OF COATING TYPE MAGNETIC RECORDING MEDIUM | [1998/21] | French: | POUDRE POUR SOUS-COUCHE DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE DE TYPE A REVETEMENT | [1998/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1997 | Translation filed | 17.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6081029 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [DY]JPH06139553 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]US5324571 (KOYAMA NOBORU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH04167225 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JPH06263449 (TODA KOGYO CORP); | [A]JPH0660362 (TODA KOGYO CORP); | [A]JPH05262528 |