EP0827932 - SHEET MATERIAL CLIPPING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. No. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozakicho Chuoh-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. No. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozakicho Chuoh-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIE, Toru, c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97907427.5 | 21.03.1997 | [1998/11] | WO1997JP00949 | Priority number, date | JP19960065924 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6592496 | JP19960080024 | 02.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8002496 | JP19960083610 | 05.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8361096 | JP19960083611 | 05.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8361196 | JP19960084978 | 08.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8497896 | JP19960224060 | 26.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22406096 | JP19960226275 | 28.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22627596 | JP19960277848 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27784896 | JP19960315983 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31598396 | JP19960316428 | 27.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31642896 | [1998/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735800 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827932 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H37/04, G03G15/00, B42B4/00, B41C1/12 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
B42B5/06 (EP,US);
B42F1/003 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00843 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5303 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53065 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53522 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53783 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | B65H37/04, G03G15/00, B42B4/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON FOLIENMATERIAL | [1998/11] | English: | SHEET MATERIAL CLIPPING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1998/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PINCER DES MATERIAUX EN FEUILLES | [1998/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1997 | Translation filed | 18.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 18.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/05] | Request for further processing for: | 28.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]JPH10175382 ; | [A]EP0694819 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * figure 4 * | [T] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10175382 A 19980630 (MAX CO LTD) [T] 1,4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6448777 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JPS6431169 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JPS61145069 (RICOH KK) |