blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0879483

EP0879483 - TEMPERATURE COMPENSATED LOGARITHMIC DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.
120 San Gabriel Drive
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
[1998/48]
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Brent, R.
18056 N.W. Chemketa Lane
Portland, OR 97229 / US
[1998/48]
Representative(s)O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Via di Citille, 85
50022 Greve in Chianti (FI) / IT
[2009/49]
Former [2002/02]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Via di Citille, 85
50022 Greve (FI) / IT
Former [1998/48]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Via del Parione, 8
50123 Firenze / IT
Application number, filing date97907572.806.02.1997
[1998/48]
WO1997US01959
Priority number, dateUS1996059909307.02.1996         Original published format: US 599093
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9729520
Date:14.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879483
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01L31/058, H03G7/00, G06G7/24
[2000/08]
CPC:
H03G3/3042 (EP,US); G06G7/24 (EP,US); H03G3/3047 (EP,US);
H03G7/001 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1998/48]H01L31/058
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/08]
Former [1998/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURKOMPENSIERTER LOGARYTHMISCHER SENSOR[1998/48]
English:TEMPERATURE COMPENSATED LOGARITHMIC DETECTOR[1998/48]
French:DETECTEUR LOGARITHMIQUE A COMPENSATION EN TEMPERATURE[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase01.09.1998National basic fee paid 
01.09.1998Search fee paid 
01.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/48]
02.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/10]
07.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4929909  (GILBERT BARRIE [US]) [A] 1,17,20,25 * column 1, line 41, paragraph 1 - column 2, line 24; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5345185  (GILBERT BARRIE [US]) [A] 1,17,20,25* column 3, line 11 - column 7, line 64; figure 4 *
International search[A]US4604532  (GILBERT BARRIE [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.