EP0883806 - CATALYST TESTING PROCESS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON 4800 Calhoun Road Houston, Texas 77204 / US | [2002/27] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Technology Licensing Co. L.L.C. 4th floor, 1401 Winchester Avenue Ashland, KY 41101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLSON, Richard, Coale, III 5147 Birdwood Drive Houston, TX 77096 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97907768.2 | 25.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997US02756 | Priority number, date | US19960012457P | 28.02.1996 Original published format: US 12457 P | US19960664836 | 17.06.1996 Original published format: US 664836 | [1999/17] |
Former [1998/51] | WO2060US12457 | 28.02.1996 | |
US19960664836 | 17.06.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732208 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883806 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883806 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0883806 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/10, B01J19/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
G01N31/10 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00286 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00364 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00691 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00704 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00745 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00747 (EP,US);
C40B30/08 (EP,US);
C40B40/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | G01N31/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TESTEN VON KATALYSATOREN | [1998/51] | English: | CATALYST TESTING PROCESS AND APPARATUS | [1998/51] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'ESSAI DE CATALYSEURS | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 31.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 05.04.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03022579.1 / EP1384995 | EP03022580.9 / EP1384996 | EP05014544.0 / EP1609526 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
18.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | 02
07.07.2004
15.09.2009
WITHDRAWN hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
18.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
02
07.07.2004
15.09.2009
WITHDRAWN hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
18.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
02
07.07.2004
15.09.2009
WITHDRAWN hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
18.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang Evonik Degussa GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Postcode 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
02
07.07.2004
18.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
Degussa Ag Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang, Dr Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management Patente und Marken Standort Hanau Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau / DE | ||
02
07.07.2004
hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger, Ricker, Schlotter, Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
Degussa Ag Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang, Dr Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management Patente und Marken Standort Hanau Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau / DE | ||
02
07.07.2004
hte Aktiengesellschaft the high throughput experimentation company Kurpfalzring 104 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias, Dr. Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2004
Degussa Ag Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Wolfgang, Dr Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management Patente und Marken Standort Hanau Postfach 13 45 63403 Hanau / DE | 13.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.04.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.11.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.08.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0004/07 | 27.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.09.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0004/07 | 16.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.09.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.10.2003 | ES | 19.01.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/46] | ES | 19.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4877584 (YATES JR JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,14,17,19,20 * column 2, line 67 - column 5, line 35; figure - * [A] 4; | [A]US5376335 (GLEAVES JOHN T [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8,16,18-20 * column 5, line 4 - column 11, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0815139 (HORIBA LTD) [A] 1-3,7,8,19,20 * figure - *; | JPH0815139 [ ]; | [A]US5342783 (SWARS HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8,11,12,15,16,18 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 28; column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 58; figures *; | [PX]JPH0886763 (HORIBA LTD, et al) [PX] 1-3,5,7,8,12,16-20 * figure - *; | JPH0886763 [ ] | [Y] - JENSEN J V ET AL, "A deactivation reactor for catalyst screening and evaluation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF CATALYSIS, (1977), vol. 2, pages 796 - 805, XP002171375 [Y] 1-8,15,17 * the whole document * | [Y] - HARUTA M ET AL, "Catalytic combustion of hydrogen. II. An experimental investigation of fundamental conditions for burner design", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, ISSN 0360-3199, (1982), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 729 - 736, XP001007196 [Y] 1-8,15,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3199(82)90022-2 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08015139 A 00000000 (...) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08086763 A 00000000 (...) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3431077 (DANFORTH JOSEPH D); | [Y]US4099923 (MILBERGER ERNEST C); | [XP] - MOATES F C, ET AL., "INFRARED THERMOGRAPHIC SCREENING OF COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES OF HETEROGENEOUS CATALYSTS", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH., American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960101), vol. 35, no. 12, doi:10.1021/ie960476k, ISSN 0888-5885, pages 4801 - 4803, XP002915843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie960476k | [X] - POSNER B, ET AL., "CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES: PERUSING COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES., ELSEVIER, HAYWARDS., GB, GB, (19940401), vol. 19, doi:10.1016/0968-0004(94)90273-9, ISSN 0968-0004, pages 145 - 150, XP001034816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0004(94)90273-9 | [Y] - BERKOFF C. E., ET AL., "MULTIPLE CELL APPARATUS FOR OF CATALYSED CHEMICAL REACTIONS THE RAPID EVALUATION.", Chemistry & Industry, SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY. LONDON., GB, GB, (19810101), no. 02., ISSN 0009-3068, page 68/69., XP000907655 | [Y] - RICHARDSON J T, CULLINANE M B, FRANK A S, "CHARACTERIZATION AND DEACTIVATION OF NIO-THO2 CATALYSTS", APPLIED CATALYSIS, AMSTERDAM, NL, NL, (19890101), vol. 48, doi:10.1016/S0166-9834(00)80273-0, ISSN 0166-9834, pages 159 - 176, XP002948722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-9834(00)80273-0 | [A] - CHOUDHARY V R, DORAISWAMY L K, "ISOMERIZATION OF N-BUTENE TO ISOBUTENE I. SELECTION OF CATALYST BY GROUP SCREENING", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS., ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN., US, US, (19710101), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/0021-9517(71)90024-8, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 54 - 60, XP002948723 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9517(71)90024-8 | [A] - HAROLD M P, LUSS D, "AN EXPERIMENTAL STUDY OF STEADY-STATE MULTIPLICITY FEATURES OF TWO PARALLEL CATALYTIC REACTIONS", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, GB, (19850101), vol. 40, no. 01, doi:10.1016/0009-2509(85)85045-4, ISSN 0009-2509, pages 39 - 52, XP002948724 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-2509(85)85045-4 | [A] - KREUZER D, TRAN-VINH L, BAERNS M, "KINETIC CHARACTERIZATION OF ALUMINA-SUPPORTED NICKEL CATALYSTS FOR THE METHANATION OF CARBON MONOXIDE", APPLIED CATALYSIS, AMSTERDAM, NL, NL, (19850101), doi:10.1016/S0166-9834(00)81492-X, ISSN 0166-9834, pages 117 - 126, XP002948725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-9834(00)81492-X | [A] - GOVIL A, ET AL., "THERMAL SENSITIVITY OF MULTI-TUBE REACTORS", Hungarian Journal of Industrial Chemistry, University of Veszprem, Research Institute of Chemical Engineering, HU, HU, (19890101), vol. 17, no. 03, ISSN 0133-0276, pages 545 - 561, XP002948728 | [A] - SCHUETH F, ET AL., "SYNCHRONY AND THE EMERGENCY OF CHAOS IN OSCILLATIONS ON SUPPORTED CATALYSTS", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, American Institute of Physics, US, US, (19900101), vol. 92, no. 01, doi:10.1063/1.458428, ISSN 0021-9606, pages 745 - 756, XP002948726 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.458428 | [A] - TAWFIK D. S., ET AL., "CATELISA: A FACILE GENERAL ROUTE TO CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19930115), vol. 90., doi:10.1073/pnas.90.2.373, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 373 - 377., XP002044712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.2.373 | [A] - JANDA K D, ET AL., "DIRECT SELECTION FOR A CATALYTIC MECHANISM FROM COMBINATORIAL ANTIBODY LIBRARIES", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19940301), vol. 91, doi:10.1073/pnas.91.7.2532, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2532 - 2536, XP002948727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.7.2532 | [A] - MENGER F M, ELISEEV A V, MIGULIN V A, "PHOSPHATASE CATALYSIS DEVELOPED VIA COMBINATORIAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19950101), vol. 60, doi:10.1021/jo00126a008, ISSN 0022-3263, page 6666/6667, XP002924194 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00126a008 |