blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0889852

EP0889852 - GASIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PUTHAWALA, Anwer
Weiselstrasse 46
D-91054 Buckenhof / DE
[1999/02]
Application number, filing date97908249.217.03.1997
[1999/02]
WO1997EP01333
Priority number, dateDE199611228828.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19612288
[1999/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9736827
Date:09.10.1997
Language:DE
[1997/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0889852
Date:13.01.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0889852
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.1997
ClassificationIPC:C02F1/461
[1999/02]
CPC:
C02F1/4676 (EP,US); C02F1/4672 (EP,US); C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/46104 (EP,US); C02F1/727 (EP,US); C02F2103/023 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4611 (EP,US); C02F2201/46115 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/02]
TitleGerman:BEGASUNGSVORRICHTUNG[1999/02]
English:GASIFICATION DEVICE[1999/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GAZEIFICATION[1999/02]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1998National basic fee paid 
17.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/02]
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1999Fee for grant paid
18.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]DD203711  (HEISE RICHARD, et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1,2; claim - * * page 5, line 3 - line 4 *;
 [X]DE3639572  (KURSA ANNA [PL], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE2620634  (LIESENHOFF PAUL) [X] 1,3 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 4 *;
 [X]US4005014  (WIKEY ARNOLD) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, line 12 - line 31 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0244565  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 4 * figure .; claim 3 *;
 [A]JPH06238277  ;
 [A]US5205994  (SAWAMOTO ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 30; figure . *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941129), vol. 018, no. 625, Database accession no. (C - 1279), & JP06238277 A 19940830 (JIYANITSUKUSU KK) [A] 5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.