EP0888615 - OPTICAL DATA STORAGE DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3dcd, L.L.C. 623 Welsh Run Road Ruckersville Virginia 22968 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states 3dcd, L.L.C. 623 Welsh Run Road Ruckersville, Virginia 22968 / US | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states APPLIED HOLOGRAPHICS PLC 22 Sedling Road, Wear District 6 Washington, Tyne & Wear NE38 9BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAHAM, Nigel, Christopher 4 Crown and Anchor Cottages Horsley, Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE15 0NG / GB | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Stewart Harry, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Gibson, Stewart Harry, et al URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Gibson, Stewart Harry URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97908375.5 | 19.03.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997GB00768 | Priority number, date | GB19960005729 | 19.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9605729 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735307 | Date: | 25.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888615 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888615 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B23/40, G11B7/26 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G11B23/40 (EP,US);
G11B7/2403 (KR);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/263 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | AL | 07.10.1998 | LT | 07.10.1998 | LV | 07.10.1998 | RO | 07.10.1998 | SI | 07.10.1998 | Title | German: | OPTISCHE DATENSPEICHERPLATTE | [1999/01] | English: | OPTICAL DATA STORAGE DISC | [1999/01] | French: | DISQUE OPTIQUE DE MEMORISATION DE DONNEES | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0554599 ; | [PX]JPH08273331 ; | [PX]JPH08194972 ; | [A]WO9308565 (APPLIED HOLOGRAPHICS [GB]) [A] 1; | [A]DE9418355U (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 19; figure 16 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930712), vol. 017, no. 369, Database accession no. (P - 1572), & JP05054599 A 19930305 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08273331 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA CORP) [PX] 1,9 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08194972 A 00000000 (PIONEER VIDEO CORP;PIONEER ELECTRON CORP) [PX] 1 * abstract * |