EP0897277 - DOUBLE-ENDED PERFUME BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fragrance International Inc. 398 E. Rayen Avenue Youngstown, OH 44505 / US | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVY, Brad 398 E. Rayen Avenue Youngstown, OH 44505 / US | 02 /
LEVY, Judy 398 E. Rayen Avenue Youngstown, OH 44505 / US | 03 /
DUGRENIER, Robert Rural Route No.1, Box 2909 Townshend, Vermont 05353 / US | [1999/22] |
Former [1999/08] | 01 /
LEVY, Brad 398 E. Rayen Avenue Youngstown, OH 44505 / US | ||
02 /
LEVY, Judy 398 E. Rayen Avenue Youngstown, OH 44505 / US | |||
03 /
DUGRENIER, Robert 304 Hudson Street New York, NY 10013 / US | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97908774.9 | 28.02.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997US03149 | Priority number, date | US19960610154 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: US 610154 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731552 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897277 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897277 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/22, A45D34/00, B65D1/04, B65D1/06, A45D34/06, B65D83/14 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
B65D1/04 (EP,US);
A45D34/00 (EP,US);
A45D34/02 (EP,US);
Y10S206/823 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/08] | A45D33/22, A45D34/00, B65D1/04, B65D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/08] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.1998 | LT | 20.08.1998 | LV | 20.08.1998 | RO | 20.08.1998 | SI | 20.08.1998 | Title | German: | ZWEISEITIG ENDETE PARFÜMFLASCHE | [1999/08] | English: | DOUBLE-ENDED PERFUME BOTTLE | [1999/08] | French: | BOUTEILLE DE PARFUM A DOUBLE EXTREMITE | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.2002 | BE | 05.06.2002 | CH | 05.06.2002 | FI | 05.06.2002 | FR | 05.06.2002 | GR | 05.06.2002 | IT | 05.06.2002 | LI | 05.06.2002 | NL | 05.06.2002 | DK | 05.09.2002 | PT | 05.09.2002 | SE | 05.09.2002 | DE | 06.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | GB | 28.02.2003 | IE | 28.02.2003 | LU | 28.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
FI | 05.06.2002 | ||
FR | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
GB | 28.02.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
LU | 28.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
FI | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
GB | 28.02.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
LU | 28.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
FI | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
GB | 28.02.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
LU | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
GB | 28.02.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
LU | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
GB | 28.02.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
IE | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
BE | 05.06.2002 | ||
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
FR | 24.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
DK | 05.09.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
DE | 06.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
PT | 05.09.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
GR | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
CH | 05.06.2002 | ||
LI | 05.06.2002 | ||
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 05.06.2002 | |
NL | 05.06.2002 | ||
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 05.06.2002 | |
SE | 05.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 05.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]IT366032 ; | [Y]US178818 ; | [Y]US2178997 (MITCHELL WILLIAM O); | [Y]US2458063 (MURRAY DULBERG); | [A]US2889065 (LAWLOR MARTIN T); | [Y]US3102650 (SEAVER DONALD A); | [Y]FR2373248 (GIUFFRE SALVATORE [IT]) |