blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0946435

EP0946435 - SLUDGE DEWATERING CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.11.2000 [2000/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNISEARCH LIMITED
University of New South Wales
Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU
[1999/40]
Inventor(s)01 / WAITE, David
119 Morrison Avenue
Wombarra, NSW 2515 / AU
02 / AMAL, Rose
24 Eucla Crescent
Malabar, NSW 2036 / AU
03 / GUAN, Jing
4/50 Kennedy Street
Kingsford, NSW 2032 / AU
04 / BUSTAMANTE, Heriberto, Alejandro
1 Barjadda Avenue
Sylvania, NSW 2114 / AU
05 / WUKASCH, Ronald F., Purdue University School
of Civil Engineering, 1284 Civil Eng. Building
West Lafayette, IN 47907-1284 / US
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date97909064.429.10.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997AU00723
Priority number, dateAU1996PO0328529.10.1996         Original published format: AU PO328596
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9818730
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0946435
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C02F11/14
[1999/40]
CPC:
G01N15/0205 (EP,KR); C02F11/14 (KR); C02F11/147 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/40]
TitleGerman:KONTROLSYSTEM ZUR SCHLAMMENTWÄSSERUNG[1999/40]
English:SLUDGE DEWATERING CONTROL SYSTEM[1999/40]
French:PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE LA DESHYDRATATION D'UNE BOUE[1999/40]
Entry into regional phase06.05.1999National basic fee paid 
06.05.1999Search fee paid 
06.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
06.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
19.09.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4752131  (EISENLAUER JOSEF [DE], et al) [Y] 6-10,16,23-27* column 2, line 40 - line 42 *;
 [XY]US5037559  (SCHMITT WAELTI [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,11,13-15,17-19,22,28,30 * column 2, line 1 - line 42 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 41 - line 62 * * figures 1-3 * * the whole document * [Y] 6-10,16,23-27;
 [X]US5366622  (GEYER STEPHAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,11,13,15,17-19,22,28,30 * column 1, line 25 - line 28 * * column 3, line 1 - line 62 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]DE4442418  (KNAUER JOACHIM FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,11,13,15,17,18,20,22,28,30 * column 2, line 4 - line 20 * * column 5, line 5 - line 65 * * column 6, line 39 - line 56 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 12 * * figures 1,3 *
International search[X]EP0316997  (CALGON CORP [US]);
 [X]AU3874193  (ANIKEM PTY LTD);
 [X]US5534139  (CADEK WALTER [AT], et al);
 [XP]US5626766  (CADEK WALTER [AT], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.