EP0937287 - POSITION INDICATION CONCERNING PERIPHERAL UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2001/01] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROOP, Jürgen Kronenstrasse 34 D-33330 Gütersloh / DE | 02 /
HARASTA, Reinhard Von-Galen-Strasse 8 D-33106 Paderborn / DE | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97909177.4 | 23.09.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997DE02155 | Priority number, date | DE1996146155 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19646155 | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821658 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937287 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937287 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/22 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G06F11/2289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/34] | Title | German: | LAGEBESTIMMUNG VON PERIPHERIEEINHEITEN | [1999/34] | English: | POSITION INDICATION CONCERNING PERIPHERAL UNITS | [1999/34] | French: | INDICATION DE POSITION D'UNITES PERIPHERIQUES | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0308043 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0209923 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * page 1 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]GB2202062 (PLESSEY CO PLC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5511227 (JONES CRAIG S [US]) |