Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001502071 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4699097 | Global Dossier | 05.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0931277 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2001 | B1 | EP0931277 | 28.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE208511T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2268864 | 16.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19781104D2 | 28.10.1999 | D2 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | DE19781104 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59705300D1 | 13.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO322058B | 07.08.2006 | B1 | NO991663L | 01.06.1999 | L | NO991663D0 | 08.04.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6220709 | 24.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | DE9702246 | 30.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9815869 | Global Dossier | 16.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1148597C | 05.05.2004 | C | CN1233328 | 27.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19641480 | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2167718T | 16.05.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100489811B | 17.05.2005 | B1 | KR20000049011 | 25.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19641480 | 09.10.1996 |