EP0931113 - SILICA COATED CARBON BLACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHMUD, Khaled 33 Liberty Street Natick MA 01760 / US | 02 /
WANG, Meng-Jiao 45 North Hancock Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
BELMONT, James, A. 8 Conant Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
REZNEK, Steven, R. 781 Strawberry Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/30] | 01 /
MAHMUD, Khaled 7 Lynne Avenue Tyngsboro, MA 01879 / US | ||
02 /
WANG, Meng-Jiao 45 North Hancock Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | |||
03 /
BELMONT, James, A. 8 Conant Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
04 /
REZNEK, Steven, R. 781 Strawberry Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | Representative(s) | Attfield, Donald James Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [1999/30] | Application number, filing date | 97909871.2 | 25.09.1997 | [1999/30] | WO1997US17134 | Priority number, date | US19960026689P | 25.09.1996 Original published format: US 26689 P | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813428 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931113 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/56, C09C3/06, C09C3/08, C09C3/12, C08K9/02, C08K9/04, C08K9/06, C08L21/00 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
C09C3/063 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C09C1/56 (EP,US);
C09C3/006 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/02, C08L21/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, PT [1999/30] | Title | German: | MIT KIESELSÄUREBESCHICHTETE RUSSE | [1999/30] | English: | SILICA COATED CARBON BLACKS | [1999/30] | French: | NOIRS DE CARBONE ENROBES DE SILICE | [1999/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6363755 ; | [D]JPH0730269B (...); | [X]JPH05178604 ; | [D]JPH05178604 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [X]EP0711805 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,25-28 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, lines 7-12; claims 1,9 *; | [E]EP0799854 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,25-28 * page 3, columns 39-45; claim 1 *; | [E]EP0799867 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,25-28 * page 2, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [PX]DE19520964 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,25-27 * column 1, lines 57-63 * * column 2, lines 52-56; claim 5 *; | [PX]WO9637546 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,25-28 * claims 1,32 *; | [PX]WO9637547 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,25-28 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, line 19 *; | [A]WO9618689 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 3,10,11,16-18 * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph L; claims 1,9,10 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 17, Database accession no. 88-116672, XP002051160 & JPS6363755 A 19880322 (DAINISHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM. MFG. AND NIPPON OILS & FATS CO.) [X] 1,25,26 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 33, Database accession no. 93-261471, XP002051161 & JPH05178604 A 19930720 (MITSUBISHI KASEI) [X] 1,25-27 * abstract * |