EP0946876 - MODEL FOR ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSIS BASED ON PROTEOHEPARAN SULFATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | MOLECULAR MODEL FOR ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSIS | ||
[2004/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siegel, Günter, Prof. Dr. med. Lichterfelder Ring 85 12279 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Malmsten, Martin, Dr. Högalidsgatan 32 B 117 30 Stockholm / SE | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Lindner, Manfred Klaus Patentanwälte Walter . Eggers . Lindner Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Lindner, Manfred Klaus, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Walter . Eggers . Lindner, Aubinger Strasse 81 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97910335.5 | 23.09.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP05212 | Priority number, date | EP19960120013 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96120013 | EP19970108723 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97108723 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9826292 | Date: | 18.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946876 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946876 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP);
G01N33/5082 (EP);
G01N33/54353 (EP);
G01N33/84 (EP);
G01N2400/00 (EP);
G01N2800/323 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | AUF PROTEOHEPARANSULFAT BERUHENDEM MODELL FÜR ATHERO/ARTERIOSKLEROSE | [2004/32] | English: | MODEL FOR ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSIS BASED ON PROTEOHEPARAN SULFATE | [2004/32] | French: | MODELE BASEE SUR L'HEPARAN SULFATE POUR L'ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSE | [2004/32] |
Former [1999/40] | MOLEKÜLÄRMODELL FÜR ATHERO/ARTERIOSKLEROSE | ||
Former [1999/40] | MOLECULAR MODEL FOR ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSIS | ||
Former [1999/40] | MODELE MOLECULAIRE POUR L'ATHERO/ARTERIOSCLEROSE | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Request for further processing for: | 05.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BE | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | FR | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | IT | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | GB | 23.09.2005 | IE | 23.09.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/07] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IT | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
GB | 23.09.2005 | ||
IE | 23.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
GB | 23.09.2005 | ||
IE | 23.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
IE | 23.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4242096 (OLIVEIRA ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 4 * example 1 *; | [XY]EP0293524 (VASOCOR [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [Y]WO9102975 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [Y] 4 * claim 11 *; | [A]US5290703 (HSU CHEN-JUNG [US], et al) [A] 1,6* example IV *; | [PA]WO9717091 (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [PA] 1,6 * the whole document * |