EP0948688 - WEATHER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR MOUNTING ON A SCAFFOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skyview Trading Ltd. First Floor Atlantic House, 4-8 Circular Road Douglas Isle of Man, IM1 1AG / GB | [2000/47] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Damitz, Thomas Berghauserstrasse 43 42349 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Stratmann, Ernst Strücker Weg 14 40699 Erkrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Stratmann, Ernst, Dr.-Ing. Schadowplatz 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97910368.6 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997EP05289 | Priority number, date | DE1996216791U | 26.09.1996 Original published format: DE 29616791 U | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813564 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948688 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948688 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/26, E04G21/28 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
E04G5/12 (EP);
E04G21/28 (EP);
E04G2005/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | AN EIN BAUGERÜST ANBRINGBARE WITTERUNGSSCHUTZEINRICHTUNG | [1999/41] | English: | WEATHER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR MOUNTING ON A SCAFFOLDING | [1999/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES INTEMPERIES POUVANT ETRE MONTE SUR UN ECHAFAUDAGE | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 26.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2000 | PT | 06.03.2001 | GR | 09.03.2001 | [2005/01] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 06.12.2000 | |
PT | 06.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | PT | 06.03.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1537080 (CHABROUTI); | [XA]DE2153026 (SIEGELLACK MAX) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4,5; | [XA]DE2345655 (GROSSMANN GOTTFRIEDD) [X] 1,6 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4; | [A]DE2853268 (MENDE ERNST WILHELM) [A] 1-3,6,8,16 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5038889 (JANKOWSKI STEVEN R [US]); | [X]GB2287728 (PILLING MARK JOHN CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2729495 (TORTEL MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,6,7,9-13,15 * page 3, line 14 - page 8, line 21; figure -; claim - * |