EP0880711 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING A MAGNETIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COEHOORN, Reinder Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KOOLS, Jacques, Constant, Stefan Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 97910581.4 | 13.11.1997 | [1998/49] | WO1997IB01438 | Priority number, date | EP19960203430 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96203430 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9825155 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880711 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880711 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09, G11B5/39 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
G11C11/16 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
G11B5/397 (EP,US);
G11C11/1673 (EP,US);
G11C11/1675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN EINES MAGNETFELDES | [1998/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING A MAGNETIC FIELD | [1998/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UN CHAMP MAGNETIQUE | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5021736 (GONSALVES EDWARD M [US], et al); | [A]WO9528649 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO9607926 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AP]EP0783112 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |