EP0934477 - A GEAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howick Engineering Limited 117 Vincent Street Howick Auckland / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Howick Engineering Limited 117 Vincent Street Howick, Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUBRAY, Bruce, Arthur 47 Paunui Street St Heliers Auckland / NZ | 02 /
COUBRAY, Alan, Keith 13 Hattaway Avenue Buckands Beach Auckland / NZ | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910647.3 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997NZ00144 | Priority number, date | NZ19960299720 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: NZ 29972096 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821504 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934477 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/28 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
F16H1/28 (EP);
F16H2001/2881 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/32] | F16H1/36, F16H1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/32] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEEINHEIT | [1999/32] | English: | A GEAR ASSEMBLY | [1999/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE ENGRENAGE | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 25.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 14.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0674122 (SCHNELL ADOLF) [X] 1-8,10-13,15-17,19-28,30 * column 2, lines 4-23 *; | [X]US1432090 (SIMPSON WILLIAM E) [X] 1-8,10-12,14-28,30 * page 1, lines 51-53 *; | [X]FR921199 (GIRODIN) [X] 1-8,10-12,15-17,19-28,30 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4446115 (YUGEN KAISHA SOZOAN MATSUMOTO) [A] 1,9,13,29 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 26 * | International search | [X]US5435794 ; | [X]US3705522 ; | [X]US4043216 |