EP0951280 - HYDROPHILIC MICROPARTICLES AND METHODS TO PREPARE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hermes Biosciences, Inc. 61 Airport Boulevard Suite B South San Francisco California 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Hermes Biosciences, Inc. 61 Airport Boulevard Suite B South San Francisco California 94080 / US | ||
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Kirpotin, Dmitri Apartment 102, 435 43rd Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | ||
For all designated states Chan, Daniel C. F. 3691 South Quebec Street Avenue Denver, CO 80237 / US | |||
For all designated states Bunn, Paul 630 Sundown Lane Evergreen, CO 80439 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirpotin, Dmitri 435, 43rd Avenue Apt. 102 San Francisco CA 94121 / US | 02 /
Chan, Daniel C.F. 3691 South Quebec Street Denver, CO 80237 / US | 03 /
Bunn, Paul 630 Sundown Lane Evergreen Colorado 82237 / US | [2003/31] |
Former [1999/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910783.6 | 02.10.1997 | [1999/43] | WO1997US17872 | Priority number, date | US19960027594P | 03.10.1996 Original published format: US 27594 P | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814180 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0951280 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951280 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/58, A61K9/62, B01J13/00, B05D7/00, B01J13/02, A61K9/51 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/5036 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
B01J13/02 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/43] | A61K9/58, A61K9/62, B01J13/00, B05D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/43] | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE MIKROPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1999/43] | English: | HYDROPHILIC MICROPARTICLES AND METHODS TO PREPARE SAME | [1999/43] | French: | MICROPARTICULES HYDROPHILES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03077488.9 / EP1369111 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Request for further processing for: | 05.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 14.01.2004 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0169618 (STERILIZATION TECHN SERV [US]) [XD] 1-5,7,9,11,13,15 * page 5, line 23 - page 7, line 3 * * page 11, line 15 - line 19; claims 1-3,8,10-19 *; | [X]EP0392487 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,8-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0454044 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 30 * * the whole document *; | [X]DE4140195 (ALFATEC PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-13,15 * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * * column 2, line 1 - line 7 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 38 - line 59 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 34 - line 38 * * column 5, line 62 - column 7, line 1 * * column 11, line 60 - column 12, line 6; examples 3-5; claims 2-9,10-12,15,16,32-28,30,21,34,37-41,52-55 *; | [X] - BODMEIER R, "SPONTANEOUS FORMATION OF DRUG-CONTAINING ACRYLIC NANOPARTICLES", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, (19910401), XP000216615 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * page 162, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 163, paragraph L - page 164, paragraph 2; table 1 * | International search | [X]US5286493 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) |