EP0939835 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Probe International Suite C-1, 220 Carroll Street Shreveport, LA 71105 / US | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELDER, Frank, B. 3024 Nottingham Drive Shreveport, LA 71115 / US | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Thomas, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2002/17] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/36] | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97910856.0 | 10.10.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997US18257 | Priority number, date | US19960028194P | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 28194 P | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815658 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939835 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, A61K39/21, C07K16/00, A23J1/00 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12Q1/70 (KR);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K16/1045 (EP,US);
C07K16/1054 (EP,US);
C07K16/1063 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5555 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRALEN INFEKTIONEN | [1999/36] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS | [1999/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS VIRALES | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2005 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9104051 (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 16-23 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 12, lines 1,2; claim 16 *; | [X]WO9104045 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 16-23 * page 7, line 5 - line 31 * * page 28, line 1 - line 9 * * page 41, line 8 - line 10; claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US5156949 (LUCIW PAUL A [US], et al) | [Y] - AIDS RES. HUMAN RETRO., 1992, Vol. 8, No. 10, KUSK et al., "Mapping of Linear B-Cell Epitopes on the Major Core Protein of p24 of Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 (HIV-1)", pages 1789-1794. | [Y] - AIDS RES. HUMAN RETRO., 1993, Vol. 9, No. 7, LAMAN et al., "A Hidden Region in the Third Variable Domain of HIV-1 IIIB gp120 Identified by a Monoclonal Antibody", pages 605-612. | [Y] - J. VIROL., September 1994, Vol. 68, No. 9, CHEQUER BOU-HABIB et al., "Cryptic Nature of Envelope V3 Region Epitopes Protects Primary Monocytotropic Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 from Antibody Neutralization", pages 6006-6013. | [Y] - J. VIROL., July 1996, Vol. 70, No. 7, McKNIGHT et al., "Location, Exposure and Conservation of Neutralizing and Nonneutralizing Epitopes on Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 2 SU Glycoprotein", pages 4598-4606. | [Y] - BIOCHEM., 1996, Vol. 35, No. 28, EHRHARD et al., "Chemical Modification of Recombinant HIV-1 Capsid Protein p24 Leads to the Release of a Hidden Epitope Prior to Changes of the Overall Folding of the Protein", pages 9097-9105. | [Y] - DATABASE ON AIDSLINE, AN 95:13321, BOU et al., "Cryptic Nature of Envelope V3 Region Epitopes Protects Primary/Monocytotropic HIV-1 from Antibody Neutralization"; & NATL. CONF. HUM. RETRO. RELAT. INFECT., (2nd), 1995, page 81. | [Y] - DATABASE ON AIDSLINE, AN 93:10991, SHI et al., "Specificities of HIV-1 Nef Protein Directed Monoclonal Antibodies"; & INT. CONF. AIDS, 1993, Vol. 9, No. 1, page 213. |