blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0934395

EP0934395 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OUBRAHIM, Youssef
61 Baronswood, Gosforth
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE3 3UB / GB
02 / O'TOOLE, Brian Michael
33 Wolveleigh Terrace, Gosforth
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE3 1UP / GB
03 / LICKISS, James Robert
29 Thirlmere Close, East Bailey, Killingworth
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 0GZ / GB
04 / GUEDIRA, Nour-Eddine
115D Osborne Road, Jesmond
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE2 2TA / GB
05 / WILLIAMS, Timothy
11 Beechwood Grove, Gosforth
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE3 5DH / GB
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2002/46]Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/32]Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date97910912.114.10.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997US18424
Priority number, dateGB1996002227225.10.1996         Original published format: GB 9622272
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9818895
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934395
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:C11D11/02, C11D17/06
[1999/32]
CPC:
C11D11/02 (EP); C11D1/22 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[1999/32]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS[1999/32]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase19.04.1999National basic fee paid 
19.04.1999Search fee paid 
19.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
23.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
07.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4478735  (YAZAKI MITSUYOSHI ET AL) [X] 1-12 * table 2 *;
 [XA]US4344871  (ALLAWAY PHILIP N ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-12 * column 10, line 60 - line 63; example IA * [A] 3;
 [XA]EP0242138  (UNILEVER) [X] 1,2,4-12 * examples 18,25-27 * [A] 3;
 [XA]US3709837  (WELDES H) [X] 1,4-12 * example 4 * [A] 2,3;
 [XA]GB2231579  (UNILEVER PLC) [X] 1,4-12 * example 2 * [A] 2,3;
 [XA]GB2020687  (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * examples 1,2 * [A] 3,7;
 [XA]WO9303131  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * example 1; table 1 * [A] 3;
 [XA]WO9323514  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,3-6,8-12 * example 1; table 1 * [A] 2;
 [XA]US4180485  (LLENADO RAMON A) [X] 1,2,4-10 * example IA * [A] 3,11,12;
 [XA]EP0349199  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,3-10 * page 7, line 45 - line 46; examples I,III * [A] 2,11,12;
 [XA]US4552681  (KOCH OTTO ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-11 * abstract * [A] 7,12;
 [XA]EP0362665  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,3-10 * example - * [A] 2,11,12;
 [XA]DE4213036  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,4-6,8-12 * example 1 * [A] 2,3,7;
 [XA]WO9422993  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,4-6,8-12 * table 1 * [A] 2,3;
 [XA]WO9311212  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,4-6,8-12 * example 1 * [A] 2,3
International search[X]US4129526  ;
 [X]US4261793  ;
 [Y]US4783281  ;
 [A]US4006110
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.