EP1011656 - A METHOD FOR TREATING TENSION-TYPE HEADACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEADEXPLORER ApS Lemchesvej 24 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2006/29] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Head Explorer A/S c/o NeuroSearch A/S, 93 Pederstrupvej 2750 Ballerup / DK | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Head Explorer ApS Lemchesvej 24 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Head Exlorer APS Forsvarvej 28 2730 Herlev / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olesen, Jes 3 Lemchesvej 2900 Hellerup / DK | 02 /
Bendtsen, Lars Skovlodsvej 7 4200 Slagelse / DK | 03 /
Jensen, Rigmor Kongsbjergvej 6 2830 Virum / DK | 04 /
Madsen, Ulf Fredensvej 6 2970 Horsholm / DK | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S, et al Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Inspicos A/S, et al Bøge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2006/26] | Hertling, Peter Inspicos A/S Böge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hörsholm / DK | ||
Former [2003/08] | Abildgren, Michael Padkjaer NeuroSearch A/S Patent Department 93 Pederstrupvej 2750 Ballerup / DK | ||
Former [2002/24] | Halberg, Kristian NeuroSearch A/S Patent Department 93 Pederstrupvej 2750 Ballerup / DK | ||
Former [2000/26] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 97911150.7 | 04.11.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997DK00502 | Priority number, date | DK19960001243 | 05.11.1996 Original published format: DK 124396 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9819674 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1011656 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/195, A61K31/485, A61K35/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/13 (EP);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/167 (EP);
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K31/196 (EP);
A61K31/197 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/223 (EP);
A61K31/27 (EP);
A61K31/33 (EP);
A61K31/4015 (EP);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/407 (EP);
A61K31/416 (EP);
A61K31/4164 (EP);
A61K31/4166 (EP);
A61K31/4168 (EP);
A61K31/4174 (EP);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/439 (EP);
A61K31/4409 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/4465 (EP);
A61K31/451 (EP);
A61K31/4525 (EP);
A61K31/4535 (EP);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/4545 (EP);
A61K31/455 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K31/4704 (EP);
A61K31/4725 (EP);
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61K31/495 (EP);
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61K31/498 (EP);
A61K31/4985 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/522 (EP);
A61K31/53 (EP);
A61K31/54 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K31/5517 (EP);
A61K31/58 (EP);
A61K31/66 (EP);
A61K31/662 (EP);
A61K31/675 (EP);
A61K31/7076 (EP);
A61K38/05 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Extension states | AL | 07.06.1999 | LT | 07.06.1999 | LV | 07.06.1999 | MK | 07.06.1999 | RO | 07.06.1999 | SI | 07.06.1999 | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANSPANNUNGSBEDINGTEN KOPFSCHMERZEN | [2000/26] | English: | A METHOD FOR TREATING TENSION-TYPE HEADACHE | [2000/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE CEPHALEES DU TYPE PAR TENSION NERVEUSE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/48] | 12.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.07.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP00204625.8 / EP1132082 | EP07107912.3 / EP1829539 | Request for further processing for: | 04.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2006 | Decision despatched | 24.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   01.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5296225 (ADEKUNLE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 37 *; | [A]WO9531195 (OLESEN JES [DK]) [A] 1-14,54-57,104,105* claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO9615782 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-14,44-52 * claims 1-11 *; | [X] - BENDTSEN L. ET AL, "Qualitatively altered nociception in chronic myofascial pain", PAIN (NETHERLANDS), (1996), vol. 65, no. 2-3, pages 259 - 264, XP002055114 [X] 1-40 * abstract * * page 262 - page 263 * * discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(95)00239-1 | [X] - DIAMOND S., "Efficacy and safety profile of venlafaxine in chronic headache", HEADACHE QUARTERLY, (1995), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 212 - 214, XP002055115 [X] 1-40 * abstract * | [X] - SOYKA D., "Der Spannungskopfschmerz", Z. ÄRZTL. FORTBILDUNG, (1993), vol. 87, no. 6, pages 477 - 481, XP002055116 [X] 1-40 * page 480 * | [X] - AULL S. ET AL, "Polypragmasie beim Spannungskopfschmerz?", WIEN. KLIN. WOCHENSCHR. (AUSTRIA), (1994), vol. 106, no. 6, pages 153 - 158, XP002055117 [X] 1-40 * page 154 - page 155 * * II. Medikamentöse Massnahmen * | [X] - STEVENS M.B., "Tension-type headache", AM. FAM. PHYS. (USA), (1993), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 799 - 805, XP002063840 [X] 1-14,44-52 * page 805, column L, paragraph L - page 805, column R * | [X] - SHUKLA R. ET AL, "Aprazolam in chronic tension type headache", J. ASSOC. PHYSICIANS INDIA (INDIA), (199609), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 641 - 644, XP002063841 [X] 1-14,44-52 * abstract * | [X] - PAIVA T. ET AL, "Effects of frontalis EMG biofeedback and diazepam in the treatment of tension headache", HEADACHE (UNITED STATES), (1982), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 216 - 220, XP002063842 [X] 1-14,44-52 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1526-4610.1982.hed2205216.x | [X] - LANGEMARK M. ET AL, "Sulpiride and paroxetine in the treatment of chronic tension-type headache. A comparative double-blind study", CEPHALALGIA (NORWAY), (1989), vol. 9, no. 10 (Suppl), pages 398 - 399, XP002063843 [X] 1-14,54-57,104,105 * "Results"; page 398 * | [A] - OLESEN J. ET AL, "Nitric oxide supersensitivity: a possible molecular mechanism of migraine pain", NEUROREPORT (ENGLAND), (1993), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 1027 - 1030, XP002063844 [A] 1-14,54-57,104,105 * "Results"; page 1028 * |