EP0944559 - AN INSULATING REFRACTORY TYPE MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING SUCH A MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMAL CERAMICS LIMITED Tebay Road Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside L62 3PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states THERMAL CERAMICS LIMITED Tebay Road Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside L62 3PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Boff, James Charles, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Boff, James Charles, et al c/o Phillips & Leigh 7 Staple Inn Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 97911368.5 | 10.11.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997GB03077 | Priority number, date | GB19960023459 | 09.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9623459 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821162 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944559 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, C04B35/63 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C04B35/62204 (EP);
C04B35/18 (EP);
C04B35/195 (EP);
C04B35/62635 (EP);
C04B35/6316 (EP);
C04B35/636 (EP);
C04B35/6365 (EP);
C04B35/66 (EP);
C04B35/82 (EP);
C04B2235/3201 (EP);
C04B2235/3206 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/3248 (EP);
C04B2235/3272 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/3445 (EP);
C04B2235/3454 (EP);
C04B2235/3463 (EP);
C04B2235/526 (EP);
C04B2235/5264 (EP);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | ISOLIERENDES FEUERFESTES MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN MATERIALS | [1999/39] | English: | AN INSULATING REFRACTORY TYPE MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF MAKING SUCH A MATERIAL | [1999/39] | French: | MATERIAU ISOLANT DE TYPE REFRACTAIRE ET TECHNIQUE DE FABRICATION | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 13.03.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5290350 (BESNARD MARIE-MADELEINE ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-8,13,17-21 * column 1, line 13 - line 25 * * column 2, line 5 - line 33 * * column 3, line 13 - line 60 * * example - * * claims 1-11,18-21 * [Y] 9-11; | [XA]US4307197 (DANIEL JOHN G ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-7,18,19 * example 1; claim 1 * [A] 3,8; | [YA]EP0338473 (MANVILLE CORP) [Y] 9-11 * example -; claims 1-5 * * page 3, line 39 - line 49 * [A] 1,2,5,7,8,14,16-21 |