EP0878557 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MELT PLATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMORI, Toshio 8-9-1, Hamakazecho,Ashiya-shi Hyogo 659 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Masashi 39-23-306, Nozawa 3-chome,Setagaya-ku Tokyo 154 / JP | 03 /
TOKI, Tamotsu 3-9-303, Minamikoshien 1-chome,Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663 / JP | 04 /
MASUMOTO, Hirohito 1095, Nishinosho,Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-01 / JP | 05 /
SAGARA, Mutsuo 11-45, Nishitakamatsu 2-chome,Wakayama-shi Wakayama 641 / JP | 06 /
MAEDA, Hiroo 6-5, Oimatsu 1-chome,Wakamatsu-ku,Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 808 / JP | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97911497.2 | 10.11.1997 | [1998/47] | WO1997JP04080 | Priority number, date | JP19960298986 | 11.11.1996 Original published format: JP 29898696 | [1998/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821377 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878557 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/12, C23C2/30, C23C2/00 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C23C2/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/024 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/06 (KR);
C23C2/12 (KR);
C23C2/30 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/47] | C23C2/02, C23C2/12, C23C2/30 | ||
Former IPC [1998/47] | C23C2/02, C23C2/12 | Designated contracting states | GB, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHMELZBESCHICHTUNG | [1998/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MELT PLATING | [1998/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PLACAGE PAR FUSION | [1998/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1998 | Translation filed | 13.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5881958 ; | [A]GB798275 (OPEL ADAM AG) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 5 - page 2, line 72 *; | [A]US2957782 (BOLLER ERNEST R) [A] 1-8 * examples 1-20 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830303), vol. 007, no. 175, Database accession no. (C - 179), & JP58081958 A 19830517 (KOUWA KOGYOSHO:KK) [A] 9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS4620564B ; | [A]JPS4541086B ; | [A]JPH01500042 ; | [A]JPH06279968 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |