EP0948341 - PHOSPHOLIPID DRUG DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SuperGen, Inc. 2 Annabel Lane, Suite 220 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Supergen, Inc. 2 Annabel Lane, Suite 220 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Amur Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 305 Old Country Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASALOW, Fred, I. 870 Crestview Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Florence, Julia Anne, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97911603.5 | 17.09.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997US17640 | Priority number, date | US19960714864 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: US 714864 | US19970799171 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: US 799171 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811906 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948341 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K31/70, A61K31/675, A61K31/335 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
A61K47/544 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Title | German: | DERIVATE VON PHOSPHOLIPIDE MEDIKAMENTEN | [1999/41] | English: | PHOSPHOLIPID DRUG DERIVATIVES | [1999/41] | French: | DERIVES DE MEDICAMENTS PHOSPHOLIPIDIQUES | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9616680 (AMUR RESEARCH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 11 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-12 *; | [X]CH685284 (TUERKAN ELDEM C O DR NUR OEZME) [X] 1-3,10,12 * abstract *; | [X]WO9413324 (VESTAR INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 8 * * table 1 * * page 17, line 8 - page 18, line 32 * * example 10 * * claims 1,3,7,10 *; | [X]US5106963 (HWANG DENG R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 24 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]CA2055990 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,10,12 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 30 * * table 2 * * claims 7,18-20 *; | [X]US5554728 (BASAVA CHANNA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,12,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 51 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X] - HOSTETLER K Y ET AL, "ACYCLOVIR DIPHOSPHATE DIMYRISTOYLGLYCEROL: A PHOSPHILIPID PRODRUG WITH ACTIVITY AGAINST ACYCLOVIR-RESISTANT HERPES SIMPLEX VIRUS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19931201), vol. 90, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11835 - 11839, XP000652229 [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 11835, column R, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.24.11835 | [X] - HOSTETLER K Y ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ANTIRETROVIRAL ACTIVITY OF PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS OF AZIDOTHYMIDINE AND OTHER ANTIVIRAL NUCLEOSIDES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19900415), vol. 265, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6112 - 6117, XP000371928 [X] 1,10 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US5194654 (HOSTETLER KARL Y [US], et al); | [Y]US5529989 (PETTIT GEORGE R [US], et al); | [Y]US5411947 (HOSTETLER KARL Y [US], et al); | [Y]US5484809 (HOSTETLER KARL Y [US], et al) |