EP0956431 - COMPACT SCROLL FLUID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIAX LLC 15 Acorn Park Cambridge, MA 02140-2390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Tiax LLC 15 Acorn Park Cambridge, MA 02140-2390 / US | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states ARTHUR D. LITTLE, INC. 25 Acorn Park Cambridge, MA 02140-2390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORNI, Ronald, J. 4 Cricket Lane Littleton, MA 01460 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97912718.0 | 23.10.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US18498 | Priority number, date | US19960736868 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: US 736868 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9819047 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956431 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956431 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/04 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
F01C1/0215 (EP,US);
F01C1/0246 (EP,US);
F01C17/06 (EP,US);
F04C2/025 (EP,US);
F05C2225/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/46] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTES SPIRALGEHÄUSE | [1999/46] | English: | COMPACT SCROLL FLUID DEVICE | [1999/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPACT ET SPIRALE POUR FLUIDES | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3525616 (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 6; figure - *; | [X]US2494100 (JOHN MIKULASEK) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 33; figure - * | International search | [Y]JPS6158992 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPS61197782 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]US2841089 (LESTER JONES JOHN); | [A]US5066206 (KAKUDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4443166 (IKEGAWA MASATO [JP], et al); | [A]US5435707 (HIRANO TAKAHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US5328341 (FORNI RONALD J [US]); | [A]US5088906 (RICHARDSON JR HUBERT [US]); | [A]US5556269 (SUZUKI AKIRA [JP], et al) |