EP0954291 - SOLUBLE FORM OSMOTIC DOSE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shire Laboratories Inc. 1550 East Gude Drive Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDNIC, Edward, M. 15103 Gravenstein Way N. Potomac, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
BURNSIDE, Beth, A. 1808 Briggs Cahney Road Silver Spring, MD 20905 / US | 03 /
FLANNER, Henry, H. 19001 Coltfield Court Montgomery Village, MD 20879 / US | 04 /
WASSINK, Sandra, E. 5103 Reels Mill Road Frederick, MD 21701 / US | 05 /
COUCH, Richard, A. Apt. 1021, 7620 Old Georgetown Road Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912802.2 | 22.10.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997US18912 | Priority number, date | US19960029032P | 25.10.1996 Original published format: US 29032 P | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818452 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954291 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954291 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22, A61K9/44, A61K9/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | A61K9/22, A61K9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | Osmotisches Verabreichungssystem für lösliche Dosen | [1999/45] | English: | SOLUBLE FORM OSMOTIC DOSE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [1999/45] | French: | SYSTEME OSMOTIQUE D'ADMINISTRATION DE DOSES SOUS FORME SOLUBLE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/01] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2911558 (ALZA CORP) | International search | [A]US5654005 (CHEN CHIH-MING [US], et al) |