EP0934137 - COLLET CHUCK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POWER TOOL HOLDERS INCORPORATED Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [1999/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBSON, Stephen, E. 18 Channel Lane Salem, SC 29676 / US | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 97912928.5 | 22.10.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997US19352 | Priority number, date | US19960735656 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: US 735656 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817430 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934137 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/20 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
B23B31/20125 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17299 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17529 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17555 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17581 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17606 (EP,US);
Y10T279/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/32] | Title | German: | SPANNZANGENVORRICHTUNG | [1999/32] | English: | COLLET CHUCK DEVICE | [1999/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE AVEC MANDRIN A DOUILLE DE SERRAGE | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1410080 (JOSEF SCHWAHLEN); | [A]US1488001 (HENRY CLARE CHARLES); | [Y]US2563112 (CHARLES HILL, et al); | [Y]US2784976 (ONDECK ELMER J); | [Y]US3035845 (BENJAMIN MILTON L); | [Y]US3811361 (SEELY R, et al); | [X]US3894743 (HIROUMI SHINBE); | [A]JPS57184610 (SEIWA SEIKI KK); | [A]US4708548 (TAYLOR PETER [GB], et al); | [A]US5431420 (HUFF ROBERT O [US], et al) |