EP1009516 - ROTATING FIELD MASS AND VELOCITY ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1201 East California Boulevard MC 315-6 Pasadena California 91125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1201 East California Boulevard, MC 315-6 Pasadena, California 91125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Steven, Joel 245 South El Molino Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | 02 /
CHUTJIAN, Ara 5610 Pine Cone Road La Crescenta, CA 91214 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97912973.1 | 23.10.1997 | [2000/25] | WO1997US19549 | Priority number, date | US19970803331 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 803331 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836822 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009516 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
H01J49/421 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | H01J49/42, B01D59/44 | ||
Former IPC [2000/25] | B01D59/44 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/25] | Title | German: | DREHFELD-ANALYSATOR FÜR MASSE UND GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2009/45] | English: | ROTATING FIELD MASS AND VELOCITY ANALYZER | [2000/25] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE MASSE ET DE VITESSE A CHAMP TOURNANT | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/25] | ANALYSEGERÄT FÜR MASSE UND GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES ROTIERENDEN FELDES | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2006 | 31.10.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2659822 (LEE GEORGE H) [X] 1-11,18-24 * the whole document *; | [X] - MIMA H ET AL, "PATH STABILITY MASS SPECTROMETER", MEMOIRS OF THE FACULTY OF ENGINEERING, OSAKA CITY UNIVERSITY, OSAKA-SHIRITSU DAIGAKU KOBAKUBU, OSAKA, JP, (196712), vol. 9, ISSN 0078-6659, pages 143 - 149, XP008052318 [X] 1-11,18-24 * pages 145-146; figure 3 * | [A] - BAUER S H, "Simple mass spectrometer", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (193510), vol. 39, ISSN 0022-3654, pages 959 - 965, XP002342453 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j150367a006 | International search | [A]US3922543 (BEAUCHAMP JESSE L); | [A]US4761545 (MARSHALL ALAN G [US], et al) |