EP0942781 - REACTION VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE Defence Evaluation and Research Agency, Ively Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Martin Alan CBDE, Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | 02 /
LESLIE, Dario CBD Porton Down, Salisbury Wilshire SP4 OJG / GB | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William D/IPR Formalities Section Poplar 2 MOD Abbey Wood 2218 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Beckham, Robert William D/IPR Formalities Section, Poplar 2, MOD Abbey Wood 2218 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver D/IPR (DERA) Formalities, Poplar 2, MOD Abbey Wood#19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97913306.3 | 20.11.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997GB03187 | Priority number, date | GB19960025442 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9625442 | GB19970016052 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9716052 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824548 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942781 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942781 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, G05D23/19, // C12Q1/68 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G05D23/2401 (EP,US);
B01L7/00 (KR);
B01L3/50851 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
G05D23/1904 (EP,US);
G05D23/22 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
B01L2300/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | REAKTIONSGEFAESSE | [1999/38] | English: | REACTION VESSELS | [1999/38] | French: | CUVE A REACTION | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05000052.0 / EP1520625 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.01.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2006/38] |
Former [2006/25] | PT | 27.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2707641 (EUROCOM ETS) [A] 1-6 * page 16, line 3 - line 28; figures 3-5; claims 1,4,5,10 *; | [X]DE3132926 (MEDIZIN LABORTECHNIK VEB K [DD]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,20,21 * page 2, line 2 - line 7 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 11 * * page 5, line 18 - line 34; figures 1-3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4735778 (MARUYAMA NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8,12,13,19,21 * column 1, line 26 - line 42 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 11 - line 20 * * column 6, line 4 - line 12 * * column 7, line 12 - line 20 * * column 7, line 49 - line 56 * * figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US5106540 (BARMA PRADEEP [US], et al) [DA] 1-4,6,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 23 * * column 13, line 11 - line 55 ** claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5241363 (GARNER HAROLD R [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7,9,21-25 * column 7, line 8 - line 36 * * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 33 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 53; figures 5,6,9,10,12 *; | [A]US5498392 (WILDING PETER [US], et al) [A] 1,9,11-15,18,19,21-26 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 44 * * column 8, line 19 - column 9, line 60 * * figures 3A,4,6A,6B *; | [DA]US5538848 (LIVAK KENNETH J [US], et al) [DA] 1,12,21-25 * column 3, line 8 - line 12 * * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 8 * |