EP0942871 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING OBJECTS ON A PACKAGING LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLINS PLC 11 Tanners Drive Blakelands Milton Keynes MK14 5LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states MOLINS PLC 11 Tanners Drive Blakelands, Milton Keynes MK14 5LU / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | ||
For all designated states MOLINS PLC 11 Tanners Drive Blakelands, Milton Keynes MK14 5LU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEAWARD, David Robert 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry CV4 8HS / GB | 02 /
WHITLOCK, Peter John 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry CV4 8HS / GB | 03 /
MARTIN, Simon 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry CV4 8HS / GB | 04 /
BAILEY, Thomas William 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry CV4 8HS / GB | 05 /
MESSING, Julian Gregory 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry CV4 8HS / GB | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/38] | Webb, John Charles, et al Molins PLC Group Patent Department Haw Lane Saunderton High Wycombe, Bucks. HP14 4JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97913344.4 | 26.11.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997GB03242 | Priority number, date | EP19960308529 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: EP 96308529 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823487 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942871 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/52, B65B43/30 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B65B43/465 (EP);
B65B43/30 (EP);
B65B43/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HANDHABEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN EINER VERPACKUNGSLINIE | [1999/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING OBJECTS ON A PACKAGING LINE | [1999/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE SERVANT A MANIPULER DES OBJETS SUR UNE CHAINE D'EMBALLAGE | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2000 | 30.11.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4580393 (FURUKAWA) [A] 1,21 * column W *; | [A]US5386678 (FURUKAWA) [A] 1,21 * column W *; | [A]US4845927 (I.C.A) [A] 1,21 * column W * |