blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0961578

EP0961578 - EAR TAG APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gardner, Michael Stuart
108 Waiatarua Road Remuera
Auckland / NZ
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
Gardner, Michael Stuart
108 Waiatarua Road Remuera
Auckland / NZ
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
Gardner, Michael Stuart
108 Waiatarua Road
Remuera Auckland / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / GARDNER, Michael, Stuart
108 Waiatarua Road,Remuera
Auckland / NZ
02 / BLADEN, Roy, Victor
292 Glenmore Road,RD 3
Albany / NZ
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/49]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date97913550.613.11.1997
[1999/49]
WO1997NZ00155
Priority number, dateNZ1996029976315.11.1996         Original published format: NZ 29976396
NZ1997032864329.08.1997         Original published format: NZ 32864397
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9822028
Date:28.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0961578
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961578
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:A01K11/00
[2000/10]
CPC:
A01K11/002 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/49]A61B17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/49]
Extension statesAL10.06.1999
LT10.06.1999
LV10.06.1999
MK10.06.1999
RO10.06.1999
SI10.06.1999
TitleGerman:WERKZEUG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON OHRMARKEN[1999/49]
English:EAR TAG APPLICATOR[1999/49]
French:APPLICATEUR D'ETIQUETTES POUR OREILLES[1999/49]
Entry into regional phase10.06.1999National basic fee paid 
10.06.1999Search fee paid 
10.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2005Fee for grant paid
11.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination23.04.2003Appeal received No.  T0855/03
01.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/03]
11.03.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/11]
19.11.2004Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
19.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP04027459.9   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 21.12.2004
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.09.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
LI07.09.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
[2007/17]
Former [2006/30]CH07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
LI07.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
Former [2006/25]CH07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
LI07.09.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
PT07.02.2006
Former [2006/14]CH07.09.2005
FI07.09.2005
LI07.09.2005
GR07.12.2005
SE07.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4120303  (VILLA-MASSONE RENE, et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,17,18 * column 3, line 22 - line 61 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 33 * * column 4, line 28 - line 30 *[A] 12,2,13;
 [XY]WO8301177  (Y TEX CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-8,10,11,17,18 * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 11 - line 36 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-5,13;
 [Y]US5462554  (GARDNER MICHAEL S [NZ]) [Y] 2-5,13 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 18 * * figures 1,2,5,6 *
International search[X]US4120303  (VILLA-MASSONE RENE, et al);
 [X]US4368735  (FILMER DAVID B [AU]);
 [X]US4672966  (HAAS JR ELMER J [US]);
 [X]US5462554  (GARDNER MICHAEL S [NZ])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.