EP0954277 - COSMETIC SELF-TANNING AGENT HAVING A SUNSCREEN EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANCASTER GROUP GmbH Rheinstrasse 4E, Fort Malakoff 55116 Mainz / DE | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZEL, Anette 18 H Foxwood Drive Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
MACCHIO, Ralph 194 Mooney Road Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | 03 /
STANZL, Klaus 47 Wyndham Close White Plains, NJ 10605 / US | 04 /
ZASTROW, Leonhard 34, quai des Sanbarbani MC-98000 Monte-Carlo / MC | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Walter, Wolf-Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Felke & Walter Normannenstrasse 1-2 10367 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914079.5 | 17.01.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997DE00119 | Priority number, date | DE1996103018 | 17.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19603018 | [1999/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725970 | Date: | 24.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954277 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954277 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
A61Q19/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/553 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHES SELBSTBRÄUNUNGSMITTEL MIT LICHTSCHUTZWIRKUNG | [1999/45] | English: | COSMETIC SELF-TANNING AGENT HAVING A SUNSCREEN EFFECT | [1999/45] | French: | AGENT COSMETIQUE AUTOBRONZANT A EFFET DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 17.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.12.2000 | SE | 13.12.2000 | AT | 17.01.2001 | IE | 17.01.2001 | LU | 17.01.2001 | CH | 31.01.2001 | LI | 31.01.2001 | DK | 13.03.2001 | PT | 13.03.2001 | GR | 16.03.2001 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
AT | 17.01.2001 | ||
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
LU | 17.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 13.03.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
AT | 17.01.2001 | ||
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 13.03.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
AT | 17.01.2001 | ||
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2001 | ||
LI | 31.01.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
IE | 17.01.2001 | ||
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | FI | 13.12.2000 | |
PT | 13.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 13.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9217159 (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [A] 1* examples 3,4 *; | [A]WO9402176 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * example 6 *; | [DA]WO9423693 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1 * examples 1-3 * |