EP0886580 - MULTI-LAYER CORRECTING AND/OR MARKING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIUS BÜROTECHNIK GMBH Senefelderstrasse 15 D-86368 Gersthofen / DE | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARAYANAN, Krishnamoorthy Tiefengasse 33 D-65375 Oestrich-Winkel / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Fritzsche, Thomas M., Dr. Brienner Strasse 52 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914095.1 | 23.01.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997DE00165 | Priority number, date | DE19961002809 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19602809 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727063 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886580 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886580 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/367, B41J31/05 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B41J31/05 (EP,US);
B41J29/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | SI | 04.09.1998 | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGES KORREKTUR- UND/ODER MARKIERUNGSMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [1999/01] | English: | MULTI-LAYER CORRECTING AND/OR MARKING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE | [1999/01] | French: | MATERIAU MULTICOUCHE DE CORRECTION ET/OU DE MARQUAGE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP (Patente) Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP (Patente) Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 07.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.04.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.01.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.11.2001 | FR | 21.11.2001 | GB | 21.11.2001 | GR | 21.11.2001 | IE | 21.11.2001 | IT | 21.11.2001 | NL | 21.11.2001 | AT | 23.01.2002 | LU | 23.01.2002 | BE | 31.01.2002 | CH | 31.01.2002 | LI | 31.01.2002 | DK | 21.02.2002 | PT | 21.02.2002 | SE | 21.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | MC | 01.08.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/30] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
FR | 21.11.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
LU | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 01.08.2002 | ||
Former [2007/17] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
FR | 21.11.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 01.08.2002 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
FR | 21.11.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 01.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/35] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
FR | 21.11.2001 | ||
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
FR | 04.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
BE | 31.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
FR | 04.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
FR | 04.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
AT | 23.01.2002 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
FR | 04.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
FR | 04.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
CH | 31.01.2002 | ||
LI | 31.01.2002 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GB | 21.11.2001 | ||
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
GR | 21.11.2001 | ||
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
PT | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 21.11.2001 | |
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 21.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3741022 (PELIKAN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12-15 * column 1, line 34 - column 5, line 23; claims 5,6 *; | [A]US4883379 (FUKUDA TSUGUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5120383 (TAKEI KATSUMORI [JP], et al); | [A]US5240781 (OBATA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9,12-14 * column 6, line 1 - line 26 * * column 8, paragraph L * * column 9, line 31 - column 10, line 42 *; | [A]EP0644063 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4-14 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 49 *; | [PA]EP0736391 (FUJI KAGAKU SHIKOGYO [JP]) |