EP0879367 - ENERGY GUIDE CHAIN WITH GUIDE STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGUS SPRITZGUSSTEILE FÜR DIE INDUSTRIE GmbH Spicher Strasse 1a D-51147 Köln / DE | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASE, Günter Oberkülheim 10 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Stachow, Ernst-Walther Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Stachow, Ernst-Walther Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/48] | Stachow, E.-W., Prof. Dr. Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914134.8 | 10.02.1997 | [1998/48] | WO1997DE00246 | Priority number, date | DE1996105775 | 16.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19605775 | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730299 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879367 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879367 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/16 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
H02G11/006 (EP,US);
F16G13/00 (KR);
F16G13/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/48] | Title | German: | ENERGIEFÜHRUNGSKETTE MIT FÜHRUNGSANSCHLAG | [1998/48] | English: | ENERGY GUIDE CHAIN WITH GUIDE STOP | [1998/48] | French: | CHAINE DE GUIDAGE D'ENERGIE A BUTEE DE GUIDAGE | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]DE29607228U (IGUS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-4 * page 7, line 30 - line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [PDA]DE4433678 (IGUS GMBH [DE]) [PDA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1249018 (GEMCO ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 124 - page 3, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4307081 (MURRPLASTIK SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH03213748 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911213), vol. 015, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1191), & JP03213748 A 19910919 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |