EP0896526 - AGGLOMERATES CONTAINING BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOCHEMIE Gesellschaft m.b.H. 6250 Kundl / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. 6250 Kundl / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANEBURGER, Johannes Prof.-Grömer-Weg 6 A-6300 Wörgl / AT | 02 /
ZEISL, Erich Wiesing 74b A-6200 Jenbach / AT | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1999/07] | Becker, Konrad Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 97914235.3 | 13.03.1997 | [1999/07] | WO1997EP01269 | Priority number, date | AT19960000474 | 13.03.1996 Original published format: AT 47496 | AT19960001445 | 12.08.1996 Original published format: AT 144596 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733564 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896526 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/545 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K9/1688 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/545, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/07] | Extension states | RO | 17.07.1998 | SI | 17.07.1998 | Title | German: | AGGLOMERATE ENTHALTEND BETA-LACTAMVERBINDUNGEN | [1999/07] | English: | AGGLOMERATES CONTAINING BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS | [1999/07] | French: | AGGLOMERATS RENFERMANT DES COMPOSES DE BETALACTAMINES | [1999/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/30] | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP02020921.9 / EP1283034 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0194880 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0414115 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9528927 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940613), vol. 120, no. 24, Database accession no. 307152, XP002034322 [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [ ] - H. LEUENBERGER, "MOIST AGGLOMERATION OF PHARMACEUTICAL POWDERS (SIZE ENLARGEMENT OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL)-THE PRODUCTION OF GRANULES BY MOIST AGGLOMERATION OF POWDERS IN MIXERS/KNEADERS", HANDB. POWDER TECHNOL., (1994), vol. 9, pages 377 - 389 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890220), vol. 110, no. 8, Database accession no. 63639, XP002034323 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - H.G.KRISTENSEN, "AGGLOMERATION OF POWDERS", ACTA PHARM. SUEC., (1988), vol. 25, no. 4-5, pages 187 - 204 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960513), vol. 124, no. 20, Database accession no. 270288, XP002034324 [AP] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - A.H.CHOW ET AL., "A STUDY OF THE MECHANISM OF WET SPHERICAL AGGLOMERATION OF PHARMACEUTICAL POWDERS", DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (1996), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 357 - 371 |