EP0891286 - YARN FEEDER WITH A PROXIMITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/03] | PROXIMITY SENSOR AND YARN FEEDER WITH A PROXIMITY SENSOR | ||
[1999/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRO AB Vistaholm P.O. Box 54 523 01 Ulricehamn / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states IRO AB Vistaholm P.O. Box 54 523 01 Ulricehamn / SE | ||
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states IRO AB Vistaholm P.O. Box 54 S-523 01 Ulricehamn / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALVARSSON, Björn Storgatan 31 S-523 30 Ulricehamn / SE | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Kinkeldey, Hermann Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Kinkeldey, Hermann, Dr.-Ing. Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97914307.0 | 25.03.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997EP01521 | Priority number, date | DE1996111998 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19611998 | DE1996212566U | 19.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29612566 U | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735793 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891286 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891286 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/22, H03K17/945 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
D03D47/367 (EP,US);
B65H1/22 (KR);
H03K17/97 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | FADENLIEFERGERÄT MIT EINEM MAGNETISCHEN NÄHERUNGSSENSOR | [1999/28] | English: | YARN FEEDER WITH A PROXIMITY SENSOR | [1999/28] | French: | FOURNISSEUR DE FIL MUNI D'UN DETECTEUR DE PROXIMITE MAGNETIQUE | [1999/28] |
Former [1999/03] | MAGNETISCHER NÄHERUNGSSENSOR SOWIE FADENLIEFERGERÄT MIT EINEM MAGNETISCHEN NÄHERUNGSSENSOR | ||
Former [1999/03] | PROXIMITY SENSOR AND YARN FEEDER WITH A PROXIMITY SENSOR | ||
Former [1999/03] | DETECTEUR DE PROXIMITE MAGNETIQUE ET FOURNISSEUR DE FIL MUNI D'UN DETECTEUR DE PROXIMITE MAGNETIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.05.2000 | SE | 31.08.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/27] | SE | 31.08.2000 | |
FR | 27.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | FR | 27.10.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4213110 (HOLCE THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 33 - line 65; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP0171516 (IRO AB [SE]) [AD] 1,8 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 9; figure 3 *; | [A]DE3911411 (IRO AB [SE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]US5172052 (WELLS PAUL [US]) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 32; figures 4,5 * |