EP0828489 - SMOKING CESSATION TREATMENTS USING NALTREXONE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Office of Cooperative Research Suite 401 246 Church Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states YALE UNIVERSITY Office of Cooperative Research, Suite 401, 246 Church Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'MALLEY, Stephanie 40 Huntington Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
MEANDZIJA, Boris 115 Underhill Road Hamden, CT 06517 / US | 03 /
KRISHNAN-SARIN, Suchitra 44 Laurelbrook Road Durham, CT 06422 / US | 04 /
O'CONNOR, Patrick, G. 27 Inwood Road Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co. Briton House, Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [1999/39] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 London Road Southampton SO15 2AD / GB | ||
Former [1998/12] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97915000.0 | 12.03.1997 | [1998/12] | WO1997US03831 | Priority number, date | US19960015706P | 13.03.1996 Original published format: US 15706 P | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733581 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828489 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/415, A61K31/485, // (A61K31/485, 31:44) | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/485, A61K31/465 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1998/12] | A61K31/44, A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | RAUCHERENTWÖHNUNGSBEHANDLUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NALTREXON UND VERWANDTEN VERBINDUNGEN | [1998/12] | English: | SMOKING CESSATION TREATMENTS USING NALTREXONE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS | [1998/12] | French: | TRAITEMENTS POUR CESSER DE FUMER IMPLIQUANT L'UTILISATION DE NALTREXONE ET DE COMPOSES ASSOCIES | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9600070 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9718781 (UNIV MIAMI [US]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y] - WAGER-SRDAR S ET AL, "FOOD INTAKE OPIOID PURINE INTERACTIONS", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1984), Database accession no. PREV198478086656, XP002158384 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - PHARMACOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY AND BEHAVIOR, (1984), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 0091-3057, pages 33 - 38 | [Y] - AHLIJANIAN M K ET AL, "EFFECTS OF CAFFEINE AND 8 PHENYLTHEOPHYLLINE ON THE ACTIONS OF PURINES AND OPIATES IN THE GUINEA-PIG ILEUM", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1986), Database accession no. PREV198681085484, XP002158385 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1986), vol. 236, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 171 - 176 | [X] - NEMETH-COSLETT R ET AL, "NALOXONE DOES NOT AFFECT CIGARETTE SMOKING", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1986), Database accession no. PREV198682076460, XP002158386 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (1986), vol. 89, no. 3, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 261 - 264 | [X] - SUTHERLAND G ET AL, "Naltrexone, smoking behaviour and cigarette withdrawal.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1995), Database accession no. PREV199598522587, XP002158387 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (1995), vol. 120, no. 4, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 418 - 425 | International search | [Y]US4946848 (TUTTLE RONALD R [US], et al) |