EP0886737 - PRESSURE VESSELS AND END CLOSURES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essef Corporation d.b.a. Pentair Water Treatment 220 Park Drive, Building 2 Chardon Ohio 44024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Essef Corporation d.b.a. Pentair Water Treatment 220 Park Drive, Building 2 Chardon, Ohio 44024 / US | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Advanced Structures Inc. 2181 Meyers Avenue Escondido, CA 92029 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBY, C., Peter 4938 San Jacinto Circle Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US | 02 /
EISBERG, Douglas 2121 Woodbury Place Escondido, CA 92026 / US | 03 /
GILBERTSON, Terry 453 Las Brisas Drive Escondido, CA 92027 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97915026.5 | 12.03.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997US03888 | Priority number, date | US19960619357 | 20.03.1996 Original published format: US 619357 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735125 | Date: | 25.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886737 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886737 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16J13/02, B01D65/00, B01D35/30 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F16J13/02 (EP,US);
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
B01D35/31 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
B29C53/587 (EP,US);
B01D2201/302 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/01] | Title | German: | DRUCKBEHÄLTER UND ENDVERSCHLUSS DAFÜR | [1999/01] | English: | PRESSURE VESSELS AND END CLOSURES THEREFOR | [1999/01] | French: | ENCEINTES SOUS PRESSION ET CAPUCHONS D'EXTREMITE POUR LESDITES ENCEINTES | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03008773.8 / EP1340931 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4358377 (CLARK GEORGE B); | [A]EP0264203 (UOP INC [US]); | [D]US4739899 (THOMPSON ROBERT W [US], et al); | [A]WO8803830 (PETERS THOMAS A [DE]); | [AD]US4781830 (OLSEN DOUGLAS L [US]) |