EP0918558 - PORTABLE FIREFIGHTING APPARATUS WITH INTEGRAL CONTROL VALVE-HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Task Force Tips, Inc. 2800 East Evans Avenue Valparaiso, IN 46383 / US | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mack, Ross J. 1305 Boca Lago Drive Valparaiso, Indiana 46383 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97915135.4 | 20.03.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997US04245 | Priority number, date | US19960634809 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: US 634809 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739802 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918558 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918558 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A62C5/02, A62C8/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A62C5/02 (EP,US);
A62C8/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/22] | Title | German: | TRAGBARER BRANDLÖSCHEINRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM STEUERVENTILGRIFF | [1999/22] | English: | PORTABLE FIREFIGHTING APPARATUS WITH INTEGRAL CONTROL VALVE-HANDLE | [1999/22] | French: | EXTINCTEUR PORTABLE AVEC POIGNEE-REGULATEUR DE DEBIT MONOBLOC | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   19.01.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5445226 (SCOTT BLAYNEY J [CA], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]DE29511370U (SCHMID BERND [DE]) [A] 1,5 * page 4, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0088029 (PRODUITS IND CIE FSE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 34 - page 7, line 1; figure - * |