EP0883885 - POWER SWITCH WITH A SPRING ENERGY STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODESA, Ludvik Eisenacher Strasse 115 D-10777 Berlin / DE | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 97915316.0 | 21.02.1997 | [1998/51] | WO1997DE00360 | Priority number, date | DE1996109407 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19609407 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9732323 | Date: | 04.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0883885 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883885 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/30 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H01H3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1998/51] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINEM FEDERSPEICHER | [1998/51] | English: | POWER SWITCH WITH A SPRING ENERGY STORE | [1998/51] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR DE PUISSANCE EQUIPE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR A RESSORT | [1998/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.09.1999 | IT | 01.09.1999 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 01.09.1999 | |
Former [2001/06] | FR | 28.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR791183 (COINDET ETS) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 98 - page 3, line 56 *; | [A]EP0222645 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 11 - line 17 *; | [DA]DE3542746 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |