EP0889995 - ZEOLITE DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRUSLOCK, Ylva Munkegärdegatan 309 S-442 41 Kungälv / SE | 02 /
DAHLGREN, Maj-Lis Kaprifolg ngen 9 S-440 45 Nödinge / SE | 03 /
LINDAHL, Lars Tom 1557 S-430 33 Fjär s / SE | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Jönsson, Christer, et al Akzo Nobel AB Legal & IP P.O. Box 11500 100 61 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Jönsson, Christer, et al Eka Chemicals AB, Patent Department, Box 11556 100 61 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97915804.5 | 21.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997SE00493 | Priority number, date | SE19960001134 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: SE 9601134 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9736048 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889995 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/68 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
D21H17/68 (EP,KR);
D06M11/45 (EP);
D06M11/77 (EP);
D06M15/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | ZEOLITHDISPERSION | [1999/02] | English: | ZEOLITE DISPERSION | [1999/02] | French: | DISPERSION DE ZEOLITE | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0540076 (EKA NOBEL AB [SE]); | [A]US5401432 (JOUBERT DANIEL [FR], et al) |