EP0940014 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEELY, Warren, Leroy 2202 W. Palomino Drive Chandler, AZ 85224 / US | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97915862.3 | 05.03.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997US03370 | Priority number, date | US19960639602 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: US 639602 | [1999/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741644 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940014 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/28, H03D9/06 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H03D7/1441 (EP,US);
H04B1/28 (KR);
H03D7/1458 (EP,US);
H03D7/1491 (EP,US);
H03D9/0675 (EP,US);
H03D2200/0043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON SIGNALEN | [1999/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MIXING SIGNALS | [1999/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MELANGE DE SIGNAUX | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 21.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5006811 (KRUGER DENNIS A [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XA]FR2669787 (ALCATEL TELSPACE [FR]) [X] 1,15 * abstract * [A] 3,6,7,9-13; | [X]EP0676861 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,15 * page 14, line 7 - line 19; figure 4 *; | [A] - TZU-HUNG CHEN ET AL, "A Q-BAND MONOLITHIC BALANCED RESISTIVE HEMT MIXER USING CPW/SLOTLINE BALUN", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (19911001), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 1389 - 1394, XP000264303 [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.90092 | International search | [Y]US4731875 (MIZUKAMI HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4992761 (SEELY WARREN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5027163 (DOBROVOLNY PIERRE [US]) |