EP0892929 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CO-ORDINATES OF SEVERAL RETROREFLECTORS APPLIED ON AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/04] | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CO-ORDINATES OF ONE OR SEVERAL RETROREFLECTORS APPLIED ON AN OBJECT | ||
[2002/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTRUMPF, Matthias Hohenzollernstrasse 24 D-76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys. Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/04] | Nierhaus, Florian, et al Patentstelle für die Deutsche Forschung, Leonrodstrasse 68 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916460.5 | 10.04.1997 | [1999/04] | WO1997EP01783 | Priority number, date | DE19961014108 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614108 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738327 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892929 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892929 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/42 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/74 (EP,US);
G01S17/875 (EP,US);
G01S2007/4975 (EP,US);
G01S2007/4977 (EP,US);
G01S7/497 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/04] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERMESSUNG DER KOORDINATEN MEHRERER, AN EINEM OBJEKT ANGEBRACHTEN, RETROREFLEKTOREN | [2002/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CO-ORDINATES OF SEVERAL RETROREFLECTORS APPLIED ON AN OBJECT | [2002/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DES COORDONNEES DE PLUSIEURS RETROREFLECTEURS APPOSES SUR UN OBJET | [2002/06] |
Former [1999/04] | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERMESSUNG DER KOORDINATEN EINES ODER MEHRERER, AN EINEM OBJEKT ANGEBRACHTEN, RETROREFLEKTOR(EN) | ||
Former [1999/04] | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE CO-ORDINATES OF ONE OR SEVERAL RETROREFLECTORS APPLIED ON AN OBJECT | ||
Former [1999/04] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DES COORDONNEES D'UN OU PLUSIEURS RETROREFLECTEURS APPOSES SUR UN OBJET | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1999 | 01.05.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.11.2002 | SE | 13.02.2003 | BE | 30.04.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 13.11.2002 | |
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 13.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4123165 (BROWN DAVID B, et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [A]US4736247 (GRAHAM OLIN L [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4763361 (HONEYCUTT THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9109325 (SAAB SPACE AKTIEBOLAG [SE]) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,11; | [Y]GB2285550 (CREO PRODUCTS INC [CA]) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document * |