EP0902777 - D-MANNITOL AND ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINARI, Tomohiro 18-D73-101, Tsukumodai 5-chome Suita, Osaka 565 / JP | 02 /
SCHUECKLER, Fritz Walter-Flex-Strasse 19 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
POELLINGER, Norbert Fritz-Fischer-Strasse 10 D-79379 Müllheim / DE | 04 /
MAEGATA, Shinji 833-147, Ohara-naka, Koka-cho Koka-gun, Shiga 520-34 / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916654.3 | 14.04.1997 | [1999/12] | WO1997JP01286 | Priority number, date | JP19960094401 | 16.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9440196 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738960 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902777 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902777 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0902777 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C31/26, C07C29/76, A61K47/10, A61K31/44, A61K9/20 | [1999/12] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/12] | Extension states | RO | 06.10.1998 | SI | 06.10.1998 | Title | German: | D-MANNIT UND SEINE HERSTELLUNG | [1999/12] | English: | D-MANNITOL AND ITS PREPARATION | [1999/12] | French: | D-MANNITOL ET SA PREPARATION | [1999/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2002
Cerestar Holding B.V. Nijverheidstraat 1 4551 LA Sas van Gent / NL Opponent's representative McQueen, Andrew Peter (GB) Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place GB-Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [2002/22] | 13.05.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.08.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.04.2004 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/17] | LU | 30.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5356896 (KABADI MOHAN B [US], et al) [A] 8* example 10 *; | [DA] - J.J. KANIG, "Properties of fused mannitol in compressed tablets", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, WASHINGTON US, (196402), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 188 - 192, XP002036028 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600530217 | Opposition | EP0645096 | - Physical Characterization of Pharmaceutical Solids, ed. H.G.Britain, 1995, pp. 18-21 | - L. Walter-Lévy, 1968, Acad. Sc. Paris, t 267, Sries C, 1779 | - F.T. Jones et al, Microscope 18, 279-285, 1970 |