EP0889896 - SYNTHESIS OF CYCLOALKYLDIARYLPHOSPHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENARATNE, K., Pushpananda, A. 1133 Kimbro Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | 02 /
MALCOLM, Arcelio, J. 1433 Ridgeland Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 03 /
ORIHUELA, Felix, M. 2478 Ascot Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 04 /
ELNAGAR, Hassan, Y. 1447 Bullrush Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97916918.2 | 24.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997US04633 | Priority number, date | US19960620824 | 25.03.1996 Original published format: US 620824 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9735866 | Date: | 02.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889896 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889896 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
C07F9/5077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/02] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON CYCLOALKYLDIARYLPHOSPHIN | [1999/02] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF CYCLOALKYLDIARYLPHOSPHINES | [1999/02] | French: | SYNTHESE DE CYCLOALKYLDIARYLPHOSPHINES | [2000/43] |
Former [1999/02] | SYNTHESE DE CYCLOALYKLDIARYLPHOSPHINES | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 18.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2437795 (CHEVES WALLING) [DY] 1-21 * example III *; | [Y]US5300617 (SUCIU ELENA N [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0196742 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-21 * examples 1,2 *; | [Y] - AGUIAR A M ET AL, "Stereochemistry of diphenylphosphide displacement at saturated carbon. Conformation and relative reactivity of menthyl- and neomenthyldiphenylphosphine homogeneous hydrogenation complexes", J. ORG. CHEM. (JOCEAH);76; VOL.41 (9); PP.1545-7, TULANE UNIV.;DEP. CHEM.; NEW ORLEANS; LA., XP002033840 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00871a011 | [Y] - J. D. MORRISON, "Synthesis of Menthyl- and Neomenthyldiphenylphosphine.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1974), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 270 - 272, XP000676372 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00916a044 | [Y] - SNIDER T E ET AL, "Convenient preparation of dissymmetric tertiary phosphines via alkylation of dissymmetric lithium phosphides", ORG. PREP. PROCED. INT. (OPPIAK);74; VOL.6 (5); PP.221-30, OKLAHOMA STATE UNIV.;DEP. CHEM.; STILLWATER; OKLA., XP000677100 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [DA] - A. M. AGUIAR, "Lithium diphenylphosphide: a convenient source and some reactions.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1962), vol. 27, pages 1001 - 1005, XP000676371 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01050a076 |