EP0882145 - METHOD OF PRODUCING LAYERED MATERIAL FOR SLIDING BEARINGS AND AN ELECTROPLATING BATH FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH & Co.KG Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2001/20] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states GLYCO-METALL-WERKE Glyco B.V. & Co. KG Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUHN, Hans-Ulrich An der grauen Hecke 10 D-65388 Schlangenbad / DE | 02 /
WIEBACH, Dietmar Blücherstrasse 28 D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Klaus Odenwaldblick 45 D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE | [1998/50] | Application number, filing date | 97917244.2 | 22.02.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997DE00354 | Priority number, date | DE1996106993 | 24.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19606993 | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9731138 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882145 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882145 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/10, F16C33/12, C25D3/56, C25D5/34 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
C25D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/10 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/56 (EP,KR,US);
F16C33/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHICHTWERKSTOFF FÜR GLEITLAGER SOWIE EIN GALVANISIERBAD ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2000/52] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING LAYERED MATERIAL FOR SLIDING BEARINGS AND AN ELECTROPLATING BATH FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD | [1998/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU STRATIFIE POUR PALIERS LISSES ET BAIN ELECTROLYTIQUE APPROPRIE POUR METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE | [1998/50] |
Former [1998/50] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHICHTWERKSTOFF FUR GLEITLAGER SOWIE EIN GALVANISIERBAD ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU528358 ; | [A]GB577335 (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]GB679947 (CLEVELAND GRAPHITE BRONZE CO); | [A]US3226308 (HARRY POCHAPSKY, et al); | [A]EP0048579 (GKN VANDERVELL LTD [GB]); | [AD]US4363854 (HODES ERICH, et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 12, Database accession no. 77-21526Y, XP002035460 & SU528358 A 19760902 (CAR IND SPEC DES) [A] * abstract * |