EP0890280 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING CO-CHANNEL INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states ERICSSON INC. 7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENNAKESHU, Sandeep 311 Glen Abbey Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | 02 /
REINHOLD, Stanley, Lynn 1119 Tanglewood Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97917642.7 | 28.03.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997US04969 | Priority number, date | US19960625754 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: US 625754 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737505 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890280 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890280 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H04B7/26 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/18532 (EP,US);
H04W16/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON GLEICHKANALSTÖRUNGEN | [1999/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING CO-CHANNEL INTERFERENCE | [1999/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REDUIRE LES INTERFERENCES DANS UN MEME CANAL | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.01.2003 | FR | 22.01.2003 | SE | 22.04.2003 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/41] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 22.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9116794 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 5; figure 2 *; | [XA]WO9512255 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13-15 * page 9, line 26 - page 13, line 21; figures 3-5 * [A] 4,5,8-12,16,17; | [A]US5463400 (TAYLOE DANIEL R [US]) [A] 1-4,10-12* column A * |